12/14/2023 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2023 | |||
Senate | 12/11/2023 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 12/11/2023 | Enacted | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | House concurred in the Senate amendment | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading | ||
Senate | 11/20/2023 | Read third, amended, (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 11/20/2023 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 09/28/2023 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 09/25/2023 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 07/24/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 07/24/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 07/17/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 06/12/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |