House | 09/05/2024 | Accompanied a study order, see H5014 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 3, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
Joint | 09/18/2023 | Hearing rescheduled to 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Joint | 09/11/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |