House | 12/18/2024 | Accompanied by S1342 | ||
House | 12/16/2024 | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 09/08/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Joint | 07/21/2023 | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD | ||
Joint | 07/17/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |