House | 06/27/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4803 | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 01/16/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2024 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |