House | 06/20/2024 | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 12/04/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |