Senate | 09/23/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 08/05/2024 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 06/17/2024 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 09/26/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |