House | 08/15/2024 | Accompanied a study order, see H4902 | ||
Senate | 06/10/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday June 10, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 12/04/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |