LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Massachusetts MA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H3113
Action History
MA
Massachusetts House Bill H3113
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session
Massachusetts House Bill H3113
Action History
House
06/24/2024
Accompanied H3108
Senate
05/21/2024
Senate concurred
House
02/12/2024
Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
Joint
05/25/2023
Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2023 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
House
02/16/2023
Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight