House | 07/25/2024 | New draft substituted, see H4912 | ||
House | 07/25/2024 | Amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted | ||
House | 07/25/2024 | Read second | ||
House | 07/25/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending | ||
House | 07/25/2024 | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending | ||
House | 07/25/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4912 | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Accompanied by S207 | ||
Joint | 06/15/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |