House | 05/28/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 05/28/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 05/28/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 06/06/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |