House | 03/28/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Accompanied by H1333 | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | No further action take on the extension to Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 18, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 09/11/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |