House | 03/04/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Accompanied by H2086 | ||
Joint | 10/17/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |