Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |