11/25/2024 | Signed by the , Chapter of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 11/14/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 11/14/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | House concurred in the Senate amendment | ||
House | 10/17/2024 | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading | ||
Senate | 10/15/2024 | Passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 10/15/2024 | Amended (Comerford) by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2960 | ||
Senate | 10/15/2024 | Read third | ||
Senate | 10/15/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 12/14/2023 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 12/11/2023 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 11/20/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 11/20/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 06/12/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |