Senate | 06/17/2024 | Accompanied S2732 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 09/14/2023 | Hearing rescheduled to 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Joint | 09/14/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |