Senate | 10/19/2023 | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules | ||
House | 10/16/2023 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 09/25/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 08/14/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 08/29/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |