House | 08/15/2024 | Accompanied a study order, see H4902 | ||
Senate | 06/10/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday June 10, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 01/22/2024 | Hearing rescheduled to 01/30/2024 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Joint | 01/19/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2024 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |