Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session

Massachusetts House Bill H3869 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 05/22/2023

                            1 of 1
HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 4347       FILED ON: 5/18/2023
HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No.         
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR
COMMONWEALTH 	OF MASSACHUSETTS
STATE HOUSE · BOSTON, MA 02133
(617) 725-4000
MAURA T. HEALEY
GOVERNOR
KIMBERLEY DRISCOLL
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
May 18, 2023
To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives,
I am filing for your consideration a bill entitled “An Act Making Appropriations for 
Fiscal Year 2023 to Provide for Supplementing Certain Existing Appropriations and for Certain 
Other Activities and Projects.”
This bill consists of $26.2 million in supplemental appropriations and a related 
authorizing section to ratify a recently concluded collective bargaining agreement with the 
Massachusetts Community College Council.
Sufficient revenues are estimated to be available to finance the appropriations and other 
measures proposed in this legislation. Because this agreement requires timely ratification and 
funding, I ask you to enact this legislation promptly.
Respectfully submitted,
Maura T. Healey,
Governor 1 of 2
HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No.         
The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
_______________
In the One Hundred and Ninety-Third General Court
(2023-2024)
_______________
An Act making appropriations for the fiscal year 2023 to provide for supplementing certain 
existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects.
Whereas, The deferred operation of this act would tend to defeat its purposes, which are 
to make supplemental appropriations for fiscal year 2023 and to make certain changes in law, 
each of which is immediately necessary to carry out those appropriations or to accomplish other 
important public purposes, therefore it is hereby declared to be an emergency law, necessary for 
the immediate preservation of the public convenience.
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority 
of the same, as follows:
1 SECTION 1. To provide for supplementing certain items in the general appropriation act 
2and other appropriation acts for fiscal year 2023, the sums set forth in section 2 are hereby 
3appropriated from the General Fund unless specifically designated otherwise in this act or in 
4those appropriation acts, for the several purposes and subject to the conditions specified in this 
5act or in those appropriation acts, and subject to the laws regulating the disbursement of public 
6funds for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023. These sums shall be in addition to any amounts 
7previously appropriated and made available for the purposes of those items. These sums shall be 
8made available through the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024.
9 SECTION 2.
10 EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR ADMINISTRATION AND FINANCE 2 of 2
11 Reserves
12 1599-4448Collective Bargaining Contract 
13Costs…………………………….………$26,233,522
14 SECTION 3. The salary adjustments and other economic benefits authorized by the 
15following collective bargaining agreements shall be effective for the purposes of section 7 of 
16chapter 150E of the General Laws:
17 between the Massachusetts Board of Higher Education and the Massachusetts 
18Community College Council.