House | 04/08/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 07/11/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |