11/02/2023 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2023 | |||
Senate | 10/26/2023 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 07/26/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Substituted for H2100 |