House | 06/06/2024 | Governor's amendment adopted | ||
House | 06/06/2024 | Governor's amendment considered (in the form approved by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading) | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | For message, see H4615 | ||
05/01/2024 | Governor returned to the House with amendment | |||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 12/26/2023 | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 07/17/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |