House
|
09/09/2024
|
Accompanied a study order, see H5035
|
|
|
House
|
07/15/2024
|
House concurred
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2024
|
Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2024
|
Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate concurred
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
No further action take on the extension to Thursday, April 18, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reporting date extended to Thursday April 18, 2024, pending concurrence
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/29/2024
|
Hearing scheduled for 02/02/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Discharged to the Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Referred to the committee on House Rules
|
|
|