03/27/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House concurred in the Senate amendment | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2696 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Read third | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 12/26/2023 | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 12/21/2023 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 11/27/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 11/27/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 11/27/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 11/20/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 07/03/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 06/29/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |