House | 04/01/2024 | Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4525 | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Read third | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 01/12/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 12/11/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government | ||
Joint | 10/20/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 | ||
House | 07/26/2023 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Education | ||
House | 07/24/2023 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |