1 | 1 | | 1 of 1 |
---|
2 | 2 | | HOUSE DOCKET, NO. 4498 FILED ON: 7/27/2023 |
---|
3 | 3 | | HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 4022 |
---|
4 | 4 | | OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR |
---|
5 | 5 | | COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS |
---|
6 | 6 | | STATE HOUSE · , MA |
---|
7 | 7 | | (617) 725-4000 |
---|
8 | 8 | | MAURA T. HEALEY |
---|
9 | 9 | | GOVERNOR |
---|
10 | 10 | | KIMBERLEY DRISCOLL |
---|
11 | 11 | | LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR |
---|
12 | 12 | | July 27, 2023 |
---|
13 | 13 | | To the Honorable Senate and House of Representatives, |
---|
14 | 14 | | I am filing for your prompt consideration a bill entitled “An Act Making Certain |
---|
15 | 15 | | Appropriations for Fiscal Year 2024 Before Final Action on the General Appropriation Bill.” |
---|
16 | 16 | | Section 1 provides the spending authorization to maintain necessary services through |
---|
17 | 17 | | August 31, 2023, pending the passage of the General Appropriation Act. This authorization is in |
---|
18 | 18 | | addition to that contained in Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2023, the Fiscal Year 2024 interim |
---|
19 | 19 | | budget, which was signed into law on June 26, 2023. All actions taken under this section will |
---|
20 | 20 | | apply to the General Appropriation Act. |
---|
21 | 21 | | In order to ensure that the Commonwealth will be able to meet its payment obligations |
---|
22 | 22 | | without delays, I urge your favorable action on this bill no later than July 31, 2023. |
---|
23 | 23 | | Respectfully Submitted |
---|
24 | 24 | | Maura T. Healey, |
---|
25 | 25 | | Governor 1 of 1 |
---|
26 | 26 | | HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 4022 |
---|
27 | 27 | | The Commonwealth of Massachusetts |
---|
28 | 28 | | _______________ |
---|
29 | 29 | | In the One Hundred and Ninety-Third General Court |
---|
30 | 30 | | (2023-2024) |
---|
31 | 31 | | _______________ |
---|
32 | 32 | | An Act making certain appropriations for fiscal year 2024 before final action on the General |
---|
33 | 33 | | Appropriation Bill. |
---|
34 | 34 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority |
---|
35 | 35 | | of the same, as follows: |
---|
36 | 36 | | 1 SECTION 1. Notwithstanding any general or special law to the contrary, the amount of |
---|
37 | 37 | | 2$6,000,000,000 is hereby appropriated for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, to meet |
---|
38 | 38 | | 3necessary obligations before the enactment of the general appropriation act for that fiscal year, |
---|
39 | 39 | | 4for the maintenance and operations of the various departments, boards, commissions and |
---|
40 | 40 | | 5institutions, including federal grant and Intragovernmental Service Fund expenditures, for other |
---|
41 | 41 | | 6necessary services and for meeting certain requirements of law. This appropriation shall cease to |
---|
42 | 42 | | 7be operative on the effective date of the general appropriation act and all actions taken under this |
---|
43 | 43 | | 8section shall apply against that general appropriation act. All expenditures made under this |
---|
44 | 44 | | 9section shall be consistent with appropriations made in the general appropriation act. |
---|
45 | 45 | | 10 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect on July 31, 2023. |
---|