Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session

Massachusetts House Bill H4033 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 HOUSE . . . . . . . No. 4033
33 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
44 ______________________________________
55 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, July 31, 2023.
66 The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the Senate
77 Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2023 to provide for
88 supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other
99 activities and projects (Senate, No. 2428), reports, in part, recommending
1010 that the accompanying bill (House, No. 4033) ought to pass.
1111 For the committee,
1212 AARON MICHLEWITZ.
1313 1 of 4
1414 FILED ON: 7/31/2023
1515 HOUSE . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . No. 4033
1616 The Commonwealth of Massachusetts
1717 _______________
1818 In the One Hundred and Ninety-Third General Court
1919 (2023-2024)
2020 _______________
2121 An Act making appropriations for the fiscal year 2023 to provide for supplementing certain
2222 existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects.
2323 Whereas, The deferred operation of this act would tend to defeat its purpose, which is to
2424 make supplemental appropriations for fiscal year 2023 and to make certain changes in law,
2525 therefore it is hereby declared to be an emergency law, necessary for the immediate preservation
2626 of the public convenience.
2727 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Court assembled, and by the authority
2828 of the same, as follows:
2929 1 SECTION  1. The first paragraph of section 12A of chapter 494 of the acts of 1978 is
3030 2hereby amended by striking out the words “and until July 31, 2023”, inserted by section 1 of
3131 3chapter 128 of the acts of 2022, and inserting in place thereof the following words:- and until
3232 4July 31, 2028.
3333 5 SECTION 2. The last paragraph of said section 12A of said chapter 494 is hereby
3434 6amended by striking out the words “July 31, 2023”, inserted by section 2 of said chapter 128 of
3535 7the acts of 2022, and inserting in place thereof the following words:- July 31, 2028.
3636 8 SECTION 3. The introductory paragraph of section 13 of said chapter 494 is hereby
3737 9amended by striking out the words “and until July 31, 2023”, inserted by section 3 of said
3838 10chapter 128, and inserting in place thereof the following words:- and until July 31, 2028. 2 of 4
3939 11 SECTION 4. Section 15 of said chapter 494 is hereby amended by striking out the words
4040 12“and until July 31, 2023”, inserted by section 4 of said chapter 128, and inserting in place thereof
4141 13the following words:- and until July 31, 2028.
4242 14 SECTION 5. The first paragraph of section 9 of chapter 277 of the acts of 1986 is hereby
4343 15amended by striking out the words “and until July 31, 2023”, inserted by section 5 of said
4444 16chapter 128, and inserting in place thereof the following words:- and until July 31, 2028.
4545 17 SECTION 6. The first sentence of the first paragraph of section 3 of chapter 114 of the
4646 18acts of 1991 is hereby amended by striking out the words “and until July 31, 2023”, inserted by
4747 19section 6 of said chapter 128, and inserting in place thereof the following words:- and until July
4848 2031, 2028.
4949 21 SECTION 7. The last paragraph of said section 3 of said chapter 114 is hereby amended
5050 22by striking out the words “July 31, 2023”, inserted by section 7 of said chapter 128, and inserting
5151 23in place thereof the following words:- July 31, 2028.
5252 24 SECTION 8. The first paragraph of section 4 of said chapter 114 is hereby amended by
5353 25striking out the words “and until July 31, 2023”, inserted by section 8 of said chapter 128, and
5454 26inserting in place thereof the following words:- and until July 31, 2028.
5555 27 SECTION 9. The last paragraph of said section 4 of said chapter 114 is hereby amended
5656 28by striking out the words “July 31, 2023”, inserted by section 9 of said chapter 128, and inserting
5757 29in place thereof the following words:- July 31, 2028. 3 of 4
5858 30 SECTION 10. The first paragraph of section 5 of said chapter 114 is hereby amended by
5959 31striking out the words “and until July 31, 2023”, inserted by section 10 of said chapter 128, and
6060 32inserting in place thereof the following words:- and until July 31, 2028.
6161 33 SECTION 11. Section 45 of chapter 139 of the acts of 2001 is hereby amended by
6262 34striking out the words “July 31, 2023”, inserted by section 11 of said chapter 128, and inserting
6363 35in place thereof the following words:- July 31, 2028.
6464 36 SECTION 12. Section 20 of chapter 449 of the acts of 2006 is hereby amended by
6565 37striking out the words “July 31, 2023”, inserted by section 12 of said chapter 128, and inserting
6666 38in place thereof the following words:- July 31, 2028.
6767 39 SECTION 13. Section 92 of chapter 194 of the acts of 2011 is hereby amended by
6868 40striking out the words “July 31, 2023”, inserted by section 13 of said chapter 128, and inserting
6969 41in place thereof the following words:- July 31, 2028.
7070 42 SECTION 14. Section 112 of said chapter 194 is hereby amended by striking out the
7171 43words “July 31, 2023”, inserted by section 14 of said chapter 128, and inserting in place thereof
7272 44the following words:- July 31, 2028.
7373 45 SECTION 15. Section 74 of chapter 10 of the acts of 2015 is hereby amended by striking
7474 46out the words “July 31, 2023”, inserted by section 15 of said chapter 128, and inserting in place
7575 47thereof the following words:- July 31, 2028.
7676 48 SECTION  16. Sections A1, 17 and 18 of chapter 128 of the acts of 2022 are hereby
7777 49repealed. 4 of 4
7878 50 SECTION 17. Notwithstanding section 2 of chapter 128A of the General Laws, sections
7979 511, 2, 2A and 4 of chapter 128C of the General Laws and section 9 of said section 128C, as
8080 52inserted by section 6 of chapter 173 of the acts of 2022, or any other general or special law to the
8181 53contrary, the running race horse meeting licensee located in Suffolk county licensed to conduct
8282 54live racing pursuant to said chapter 128A and simulcast wagering pursuant to said chapter 128C
8383 55in calendar year 2023 shall remain licensed as a running horse racing meeting licensee and shall
8484 56remain authorized to conduct simulcast wagering pursuant to said chapter 128C until the later of
8585 57July 31, 2028 or the expiration of the term of a category 2 sports wagering license, pursuant to
8686 58chapter 23N of the General Laws, held by such licensee as of July 31, 2028 or any renewal
8787 59thereof; provided, however, that the days between January 1, 2023 and December 31, 2028 shall
8888 60be dark days pursuant to said chapter 128C and the licensee shall be precluded from conducting
8989 61live racing during that period unless it applies for and is granted a supplemental live racing
9090 62license pursuant to said chapter 128A; provided further, that the licensee shall not simulcast or
9191 63accept a wager on greyhound dog racing on or after August 10, 2023 pursuant to section 9 of
9292 64chapter 128C of the General Laws; provided further, that all simulcasts shall comply with the
9393 65Interstate Horse Racing Act of 1978, 15 U.S.C. 3001 et seq. or other applicable federal law;
9494 66provided further, that all simulcasts from states which have racing associations that do not
9595 67require approval in compliance with the Interstate Horse Racing Act of 1978, 15 U.S.C.
9696 683004(a)(1)(A) shall require the approval of the New England Horsemen’s Benevolent &
9797 69Protective Association prior to being simulcast to a racing meeting licensee within the
9898 70commonwealth; and provided further, that if the association agrees to approve the simulcast for 1
9999 71racing meeting licensee, it shall approve the simulcast for all otherwise eligible racing meeting
100100 72licensees.