11/15/2023 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2023 | |||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Re-enacted and again laid before the Governor | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Re-enacted - 132 YEAS to 26 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 63) | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Emergency preamble adopted | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Senate concurred in the House amendment | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Governor's amendment rejected | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Amendment adopted | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Governor's amendment considered (in the form approved by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading) | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted | ||
House | 08/10/2023 | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading | ||
House | 08/10/2023 | For message, see H4055, Attachment E | ||
House | 08/10/2023 | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment | ||
House | 08/10/2023 | Enacted as sections 50, 85 and 111 of the General Appropriation Bill, see H4040 |