House | 05/28/2024 | Accompanied a new draft, see H4676 | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 29, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 1, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 01/12/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 01/22/2024 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 | ||
House | 07/06/2023 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses | ||
House | 07/03/2023 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |