04/04/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 09/26/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 | ||
Senate | 08/31/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 08/28/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |