House | 07/10/2024 | Accompanied a new draft, see H4832 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 11/15/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 | ||
House | 09/21/2023 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary | ||
House | 09/18/2023 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |