House | 06/17/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 06/10/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday June 10, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 12/04/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security | ||
House | 08/10/2023 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |