11/28/2023 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2023 | |||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 11/27/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 11/22/2023 | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules | ||
House | 11/20/2023 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 11/20/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 11/20/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 11/06/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |