Senate | 07/02/2024 | Accompanied a new draft, see S2839 | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 06/05/2024 | Reporting date extended to Friday June 28, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Reporting date extended to Saturday June 1, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 01/10/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
House | 12/26/2023 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development | ||
House | 07/17/2023 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |