Senate | 04/25/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 01/12/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 01/02/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |