Senate | 11/21/2024 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 11/18/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 05/30/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 28, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 19, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |