LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Massachusetts MA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H4274
Action History
MA
Massachusetts House Bill H4274
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session
Massachusetts House Bill H4274
Action History
House
05/28/2024
Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Senate
04/11/2024
Senate concurred
House
03/28/2024
Reporting date extended to Saturday June 1, 2024, pending concurrence
House
01/25/2024
Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
House
01/25/2024
New draft of S189, H284, H347 and H3564
House
01/25/2024
Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure