House | 07/15/2024 | Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4868 | ||
House | 07/15/2024 | Read third | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 02/07/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 02/07/2024 from 04:00 PM-12:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |