House | 07/17/2024 | Accompanied a study order, see H4870 | ||
Joint | 04/16/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Recommitted to the committee on Revenue | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |