House
|
04/24/2024
|
Reported, in part, by H4582
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Committee of conference appointed (Rodrigues-Friedman-O'Connor), in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Senate insisted on its amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Committee of conference appointed - (Michlewitz-Ferrnate-Smola)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #121 (Yeas 32 to Nays 8)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Read third
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Reprinted, as amended, see S2711
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2708
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Read second
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Order relative to subject matter adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2708
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Passed to be engrossed - 121 YEAS to 33 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 81 )
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
H4460, published as amended
|
|
|