House | 04/03/2024 | New draft substituted, see H4529 | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4529 | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means | ||
Joint | 03/22/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2024 from 09:00 AM-02:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | New draft of H4283 | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Reported from the committee on Transportation |