Senate | 07/18/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 06/27/2024 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 06/10/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 05/02/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2024 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |