Senate | 12/16/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 12/16/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 07/18/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 07/03/2024 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 07/02/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 06/24/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 06/24/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 05/28/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 05/10/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |