LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Massachusetts MA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H4590
Action History
MA
Massachusetts House Bill H4590
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session
Massachusetts House Bill H4590
Action History
House
11/18/2024
Accompanied a new draft, see H5107
Senate
07/30/2024
Senate concurred
House
07/01/2024
Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
House
05/30/2024
Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Joint
05/10/2024
Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
House
04/26/2024
Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service