House
|
07/19/2024
|
Accompanied H4800
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2024
|
Reported, in part, by H4800
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Committee of conference appointed (Rodrigues- Friedman-O'Connor), in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Senate insisted on its amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Committee of conference appointed - (Michlewitz-Ferrnate-Smola)
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #178 (Yeas 40 to Nays 0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Reprinted as amended, see S2800
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S4
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
For Senate actions, see S4
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read second
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, May 21, 2024 pursuant to an order previously adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S4
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Passed to be engrossed - 153 YEAS to 4 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 104 )
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
H4600, published as amended
|
|
|