08/27/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 191 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 08/20/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 08/20/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 08/16/2024 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 08/16/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 06/27/2024 | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 06/24/2024 | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 06/03/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 06/03/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 06/03/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |