Senate | 07/25/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 07/18/2024 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 07/17/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 07/17/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 06/24/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 05/30/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
House | 05/30/2024 | New draft of H4588 | ||
House | 05/30/2024 | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |