House
|
12/19/2024
|
Accompanied H5143
|
|
|
House
|
12/17/2024
|
Reported by H5143
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2024
|
Committee of conference appointed (Crighton-Velis-Fattman), in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2024
|
Senate insists on its amendment
|
|
|
House
|
07/31/2024
|
Committee of conference appointed - (Madaro-Peisch-Soter)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
07/31/2024
|
House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Passed to be engrossed (standing vote 12-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Read third
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Reprinted, as amended, see S2921
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text for S2898
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Read second
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/29/2024
|
Placed in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, July 30. 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/29/2024
|
Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2898
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2024
|
Order relative to subject matter adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Passed to be engrossed - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 123 )
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
H4743, published as amended
|
|
|