LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Massachusetts MA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H4770
Action History
MA
Massachusetts House Bill H4770
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session
Massachusetts House Bill H4770
Action History
House
07/18/2024
Accompanied a new draft, see H4880
Joint
06/24/2024
Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2024 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
Senate
06/20/2024
Senate concurred
House
06/17/2024
Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight