House | 07/31/2024 | New draft substituted, see H4967 | ||
House | 07/31/2024 | Amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted | ||
House | 07/31/2024 | Read second | ||
House | 07/31/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending | ||
House | 07/31/2024 | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending | ||
House | 07/31/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4967 | ||
House | 07/25/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means | ||
Joint | 07/12/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 07/11/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 07/10/2024 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources | ||
House | 07/08/2024 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |