House | 08/15/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 08/15/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 08/15/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 07/22/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 07/12/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2024 from 12:55 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 07/11/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 07/08/2024 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |